EP3979291 - ELECTRONICS MODULE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiefl, Stefan 80992 München / DE | 02 /
Raab, Oliver 94496 Ortenburg / DE | 03 /
Schwarz, Markus 80796 München / DE | 04 /
Wilke, Hans 85599 Parsdorf / DE | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20199173.4 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979291 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01H59/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H01H59/0009 (EP,US);
H01H2001/0084 (EP);
H01H2059/0063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONIKMODUL UND ANLAGE | [2022/14] | English: | ELECTRONICS MODULE AND SYSTEM | [2022/14] | French: | MODULE ÉLECTRONIQUE ET INSTALLATION | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 27.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19854450 (TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0011]; figures 1-2 *; | [YA]US2008174390 (NGUYEN ANH TUAN [VN], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * [A] 1-8,10,11; | [YA]EP2398028 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 1-5,7-11; | [YA]US8659326 (CLAYDON GLENN [US], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract *[A] 1-8,10,11; | [XYI]US2014158506 (YOON JUN BO [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * paragraphs [0056] - [0078]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 6 [I] 5,10,11 | by applicant | WO2018028947 | DE102017215236 |