EP3804944 - TOOL HALF AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN INJECTION MOULDED PART WITH AT LEAST ONE SOCKET-TYPE INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lisa Dräxlmaier GmbH Landshuter Strasse 100 84137 Vilsbiburg / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esterbauer, Peter Griesbach 8 5282 Ranshofen / AT | 02 /
Püschel, Stefan Vormarkt Gurten 30 4982 Obernberg/Inn / AT | 03 /
Peterlechner, Hermann Scheuhub 7 5145 Neukirchen / AT | 04 /
Greifeneder, Daniel Aselkam 2 4963 St. Peter am Hart / AT | 05 /
Rainer, Liedtke Stelzhamerstraße 8 5280 Braunau/Inn / AT | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 20199229.4 | 30.09.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | DE201910126938 | 08.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019126938 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804944 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3804944 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B29C33/12, B29C45/84, B29C45/76 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B29C45/14032 (EP);
B29C45/14065 (CN);
B29C45/14008 (CN);
B29C45/14073 (EP);
B29C45/14336 (CN);
B29C45/14614 (CN);
B29C45/2602 (CN);
B29C45/762 (EP);
B29C45/842 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WERKZEUGHÄLFTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES SPRITZGUSSTEILS MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM BUCHSENARTIGEN EINLEGETEIL | [2021/15] | English: | TOOL HALF AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN INJECTION MOULDED PART WITH AT LEAST ONE SOCKET-TYPE INSERT | [2021/15] | French: | MOITIÉ D'OUTIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIÈCE MOULÉE PAR INJECTION POURVU D'AU MOINS UNE PIÈCE D'INSERTION EN FORME DE DOUILLE | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 04.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.04.2022 | CY | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | IT | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | PL | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | IE | 30.09.2022 | LU | 30.09.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 30.09.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
LU | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | DK | 20.04.2022 | |
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 20.04.2022 | |
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 20.04.2022 | |
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 20.04.2022 | |
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 20.04.2022 | |
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 20.04.2022 | |
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3303256 (MORIN LOUIS H) [Y] 1-3,5,7-11 * page 2, line 61 - page 3, line 20; figures 2-4 *; | [XAY]DE7417692U (UIROYAL AG) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraph [0024]; figures 2,3; claim 4 * [A] 4,6 [Y] 1-3,5,7-11; | [XY]CH634505 (STOECKLI DANIEL [CH]) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1-7 * [Y] 1-3,5,7-11; | [YA]DE3135259 (WILHELM WEBER KG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,7-11 * page 3; figures 1-8; claims 1-3 * * page 13 - page 14, paragraph 1 * [A] 4,6; | [XY]US4443173 (MANSBERGER II ROBERT L [US]) [X] 1,2 * figures 3,4 * [Y] 1-3,5,7-11; | [XY]DD251103 (ELEKTROGERAETE INGBUERO VEB [DD]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * figures 1,3 * [Y] 1-3,5,7-11; | [XAY]DE10322622 (MENZOLIT FIBRON GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0005] , [0015] , [0021]; figure 1 * [A] 4-11 [Y] 3; | [A]DE102011120403 (ZAHORANSKY AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,8-11 * paragraph [0013] *; | [A]DE102015114270 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 1,2,4* paragraph [0031]; figures 1-5 * |