EP3977932 - BIO-SIGNAL MEASURING DEVICE AND BIO-SIGNAL MEASURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atsens Co., Ltd. 806-ho, 11, Gumi-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13637 / KR | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Jong Ook 13625 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, Chang Ho 13247 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
LEE, Bang Won 16923 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Locas, Davide, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20199380.5 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3977932 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/332, A61B5/335, // A61B5/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/335 (EP);
A61B5/332 (EP);
A61B2560/0276 (EP);
A61B2560/0295 (EP);
A61B5/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOSIGNALMESSVORRICHTUNG UND BIOSIGNALMESSVERFAHREN | [2022/14] | English: | BIO-SIGNAL MEASURING DEVICE AND BIO-SIGNAL MEASURING METHOD | [2022/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE BIO-SIGNAL | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2020 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2917961 (PARSYS SANTE SOC PAR ACTIONS S [FR]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * figures 8A, 8B, 9 * * page 16, line 23 - page 19, line 34 * [I] 4-8,12-15; | [XI]WO2009112976 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,13-15 * figures 5, 12a, 12b * * page 9, lines 10-12 * * page 11, lines 33-34 * * page 20, lines 18-21 * * page 21, lines 17-25 * * page 22, line 33 - page 23, line 8 * * page 23, lines 18-22 * * page 24, lines 4-9 * * page 43, line 33 - page 44, line 31 * [I] 3,4,8,11,12; | [XI]US2010076331 (CHAN HSIAO-LUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-10,14 * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] - [0 23] * [I] 3-5,7,11-13,15; | [XI]WO2011146708 (MEDICOMP INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-11,14,15 * figures 4, 8 * * paragraphs [0054] , [0058] , [0061] , [0065] , [0073] *[I] 4,5,12,13 |