EP3796186 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR A DISTRIBUTED DATABASE WITHIN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hedera Hashgraph, LLC 3400 N. Central Expressway, Suite 470B Richardson TX 75080 / US | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Swirlds, Inc. 3400 N Central Expwy, Ste. 470 Richardson, TX 75080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIRD, Leemon C., III 3400 N Central Expwy, Ste. 470 Richardson, TX Texas 75080 / US | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20199607.1 | 26.08.2016 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | US201562211411P | 28.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562211411 P | US201614988873 | 06.01.2016 Original published format: US201614988873 | US201615153011 | 12.05.2016 Original published format: US201615153011 | US201662344682P | 02.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344682 P | US201615205688 | 08.07.2016 Original published format: US201615205688 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796186 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/27, G06Q20/06, // G06F21/00 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F16/2458 (CN);
G06F16/25 (RU);
G06F21/64 (EP);
G06Q20/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VERTEILTE DATENBANK INNERHALB EINES NETZWERKS | [2021/12] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR A DISTRIBUTED DATABASE WITHIN A NETWORK | [2021/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR UNE BASE DE DONNÉES DISTRIBUÉE DANS UN RÉSEAU | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 24.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16842700.3 / EP3341864 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014012812 (ZUNGER YONATAN [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 7 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A]WO2015094329 (HITACHI DATA SYSTEMS ENGINEERING UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * Summary of the invention, first paragraph; page 1 ** page 26 - page 27 *; | [I] - Jae Kwon, "Tendermint: Consensus without Mining", (20150319), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150319035333if_/http://tendermint.com:80/docs/tendermint.pdf, (20180719), XP055493960 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [L] - Jae Kwon, "Tendermint (capture)", (20150319), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150319035333if_/http://tendermint.com:80/docs/tendermint.pdf, (20180719), XP055493977 [L] 1-15 |