EP3805185 - ZIRCONIA SINTERED BODY AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Akiko c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Nanyo Complex 4560, Kasei-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Ayako c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Nanyo Complex 4560, Kasei-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | 03 /
Azechi, Sho c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Nanyo Complex 4560, Kasei-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | 04 /
Nagayama, Hitoshi c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Nanyo Complex 4560, Kasei-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | 05 /
Fujisaki, Hiroyuki c/o TOSOH CORPORATION Nanyo Complex 4560, Kasei-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 20199626.1 | 01.10.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | JP20190185075 | 08.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019185075 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805185 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/486, C04B35/488, C04B35/626, C04B35/64, C01G25/00, C01G25/02, A61C13/00, A61K6/818, A61K6/822 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
C04B35/486 (EP);
C04B35/48 (KR);
C04B35/4885 (EP,CN,US);
A61C13/0022 (EP);
A61C13/082 (EP);
A61K6/17 (EP);
A61K6/818 (EP,CN);
A61K6/822 (EP);
C01G25/00 (EP);
C01G25/02 (EP);
C04B35/488 (EP);
C04B35/622 (CN,KR);
C04B35/626 (CN);
C04B35/62625 (EP);
C04B35/64 (EP);
C04B35/645 (US);
A61C13/083 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/54 (EP);
C01P2002/60 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,CN,KR);
C04B2235/3246 (EP,KR,US);
C04B2235/5409 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/5472 (EP);
C04B2235/549 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/608 (EP);
C04B2235/6562 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/661 (EP);
C04B2235/668 (KR);
C04B2235/76 (EP);
C04B2235/762 (EP,US);
C04B2235/765 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/785 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIRKONIUMOXID-SINTERKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2021/15] | English: | ZIRCONIA SINTERED BODY AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2021/15] | French: | CORPS FRITTÉ EN ZIRCONE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 07.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008222450 (TOSOH CORP); | [AD]JP2011073907 (WORLD LAB KK); | [XA]EP3088373 (TOSOH CORP [JP]); | [XDA]JP2018052806 (TOSOH CORP); | [XAI]US2018235847 (BALASUBRAMANIAN SREERAM [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2011073907 | JP2015143178 | JP2018052806 | JP2019185075 |