EP3795765 - ROBOTIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Q-Bot Limited Riverside Business Park Bendon Valley Wandsworth London SW18 4UQ / GB | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPINSKI, Tomasz B 38A Cumberland Rd Hanwell, Greater London W7 2EB / GB | 02 /
CHILDS, Peter RN 15 Princes Square Hove, Sussex BN3 4GE / GB | 03 /
HOLLOWAY, Mathew c/o Q-Bot Limited Block G, Riverside Business Centre Bendon Valley Wandsworth, London SW18 4UQ / GB | [2021/43] |
Former [2021/13] | 01 /
LIPINSKI, Tomasz B 38A Cumberland Rd Hanwell London / GB | ||
02 /
CHILDS, Peter RN 15 Princes Square Hove, Sussex BN3 4GE / GB | |||
03 /
HOLLOWAY, Mathew c/o Q-Bot Limited Block G, Riverside Business Centre Bendon Valley Wandsworth London, SW18 4UQ / GB | |||
Former [2021/12] | 01 /
LIPINSKI, Tomasz B 38A Cumberland Rd Hanwell London / GB | ||
02 /
CHILDS, Peter RN 15 Princes Square Hove, Sussex BN3 4GE / GB | |||
03 /
HOLLOWAY, Mathew Riverside Business Park Bendon Valley Wandsworth London, SW18 4UQ / GB | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/12] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20200024.6 | 23.05.2014 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | GB20130009324 | 23.05.2013 Original published format: GB 201309324 | GB20130011928 | 03.07.2013 Original published format: GB 201311928 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3795765 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3795765 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/76, B05B13/00, B05B13/04, B25J5/00, E04F21/16, B05B12/08, B25J11/00, E04F21/12 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
B25J11/0075 (EP,US);
B05B13/0431 (EP,GB,US);
B05B13/005 (EP,GB,US);
B05B13/0405 (EP,US);
B05B3/00 (US);
B05D1/02 (US);
B25J11/0055 (EP,US);
B25J15/0019 (US);
B25J15/04 (US);
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B62D21/14 (GB);
E04B1/74 (GB);
E04B1/76 (EP,US);
G05D1/0094 (EP);
G05D1/0274 (EP);
B05B12/084 (EP);
B05B12/18 (EP);
E04F21/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROBOTISCHES FAHRZEUG | [2021/12] | English: | ROBOTIC VEHICLE | [2021/12] | French: | VÉHICULE ROBOTISÉ | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14727035.9 / EP2999829 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH0466154 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [X] 1-3,7,9,11-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003]; figure - * [Y] 4-6 [I] 8,10; | [Y]JP2000034790 (SUNRISE KOGYO KK) [Y] 4-6 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0051]; figure - *; | [A]WO2005070657 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 8 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0190]; figure - *; | [A]JP4017717B (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC) [A] 10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0045]; figure - *; | [A]JP2008055569 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0228]; figure - * | by applicant | GB2046339 | WO0173235 | US2002112442 | DE10211331 | WO2006071519 | WO2009037550 | CN101435221 | EP2213805 | WO2011021080 | US2011138724 | JP5163769B | CA2790710 |