EP3812074 - A COMPOUND AND A METHOD OF USING THE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place, 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmed, Shamraze c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Clare, Adam c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 03 /
Kell, James c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 04 /
Clark, Daniel c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 05 /
Speidel, Alistair c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 06 /
Castro Palacios, Monica c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 07 /
Smith, Peter c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 08 /
Novovic, Donka c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20200308.3 | 06.10.2020 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | GB20190014825 | 14.10.2019 Original published format: GB 201914825 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812074 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23H1/08, B23H9/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
B23H1/08 (EP,US);
B01J13/0065 (US);
B23H1/04 (US);
B23H1/10 (US);
B23H9/001 (EP);
C08J3/075 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU VERWENDUNG DER VERBINDUNG | [2021/17] | English: | A COMPOUND AND A METHOD OF USING THE COMPOUND | [2021/17] | French: | COMPOSÉ ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DU COMPOSÉ | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 22.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009166329 (CORS JORGE [CH], et al) [X] 8,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0095] *; | [A]WO2012103017 (PERFECT POINT EDM CORP [US], et al)[A] 8,9,12; | [XAI]CH705973 (UNIV GENEVE L [CH]) [X] 1,8,10 * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * [A] 9,11,13-15 [I] 12; | [X]US2018280296 (SARUHASHI KOICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0076] * |