Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3799395 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3799395



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1311
24.05.2023 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.08.2022 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
23.06.2022 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.06.2022 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
14.06.2022 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.06.2022 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
23.02.2022 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.02.2022 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
23.02.2022 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.02.2022 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 215
23.02.2022 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 215
14.01.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.01.2022 Claims Search / examination 3
14.01.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.01.2022 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
10.09.2021 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.09.2021 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.09.2021 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.09.2021 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 215
10.09.2021 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 215
18.08.2021 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.04.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2021 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
07.04.2021 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
17.03.2021 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2021 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.03.2021 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.01.2021 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.01.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.01.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 1
20.01.2021 European search report Search / examination 2
20.01.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
07.12.2020 Search started Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.11.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.10.2020 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.10.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
07.10.2020 Description Search / examination 146
07.10.2020 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
07.10.2020 Drawings Search / examination 71
07.10.2020 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.10.2020 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
01.09.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 153