EP3982204 - TIMEPIECE RESONATOR COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE FLEXIBLE GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINAUX, Baptiste 1006 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
WINKLER, Pascal 2072 St-Blaise / CH | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20200689.6 | 08.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982204 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G04B15/14, G04B17/04, G04B31/00, G04B31/02 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
G04B17/045 (EP,US);
G04B15/14 (EP);
G04B17/32 (US);
G04B31/00 (EP);
G04B31/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UHRRESONATOR, DER MINDESTENS EINE FLEXIBLE FÜHRUNG UMFASST | [2022/15] | English: | TIMEPIECE RESONATOR COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE FLEXIBLE GUIDE | [2022/15] | French: | RESONATEUR D'HORLOGERIE COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN GUIDAGE FLEXIBLE | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 13.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH715641 (ETA SA MFT HORLOGERE SUISSE [CH]) | by applicant | EP3035126 | EP3206089 | CH714024 | CH714031 | EP3667432 | EP20180179623 |