EP3804907 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ABRASIVE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitz-Metallographie GmbH Kaiserstrasse 100 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Füllmann, Robert Schmitz-Metallographie GmbH Kaiserstraße 100 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Heeschen Pültz Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 60 10 61 22210 Hamburg / DE | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/15] | Pültz, Roland Baaderstraße 56D 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20200767.0 | 08.10.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | DE201910127341 | 10.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019127341 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804907 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3804907 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B24D11/00, B24D11/04, B24D18/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B24D11/001 (EP);
B24D11/04 (EP);
B24D18/0072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ABRASIVEINHEIT | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ABRASIVE UNIT | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE UNITÉ ABRASIVE | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 24.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9900218 (VER SCHMIRGEL & MASCHF [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9 * page 17, line 22 - page 18, line 28; figures 5-7 * [I] 11,15; | [A]US2016114458 (BAJAJ RAJEEV [US], et al) [A] 10* figures 2F-2K *; | [X]DE102015216538 (DIABÜ-DIAMANTWERKZEUGE HEINZ BÜTTNER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0012] , [0021] , [0032] - [0034]; figures 2,4; claim 9 * | Examination | DE102014207047 |