EP3981515 - CRUSHING DEVICE FOR CRUSHING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doppstadt Beteiligungs GmbH Steinbrink 4 42555 Velbert / DE | [2023/08] |
Former [2022/15] | For all designated states LIG GmbH Haberstrasse 42 42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOPPSTADT, Ferdinand 42555 Velbert / DE | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Weidener, Jörg Michael Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20200935.3 | 09.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981515 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3981515 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/24, B02C18/00, B02C18/14, // B02C18/16 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B02C18/24 (EP);
B02C18/0084 (EP);
B02C18/145 (EP);
B02C2018/164 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZERKLEINERUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ZERKLEINERUNG VON ZERKLEINERUNGSGUT | [2022/15] | English: | CRUSHING DEVICE FOR CRUSHING MATERIAL | [2022/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BROYAGE PERMETTANT DE BROYER UN PRODUIT DEVANT ÊTRE BROYÉ | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/23] | 03.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.2023
05.03.2024
WITHDRAWN Eschlböck-Maschinenbau Gesellschaft m.b.H. Grieskrichnerstrasse 5 4731 Prambachkirchen / AT Opponent's representative Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Engerthstraße 146/3/1 1200 Wien / AT | [2024/15] |
Former [2024/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.2023
02.01.2024
ADMISSIBLE Eschlböck-Maschinenbau Gesellschaft m.b.H. Grieskrichnerstrasse 5 4731 Prambachkirchen / AT Opponent's representative Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Engerthstraße 146/3/1 1200 Wien / AT | 16.01.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.03.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 25.03.2024 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | LU | 09.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
LU | 09.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | DK | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
LU | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | DK | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | DK | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3873035 (BENSON RUSSELL RICHARD) [Y] 13 * column 12, line 20 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [XYI]US2011272513 (LEWIS JR JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070]; figures 3, 8a * [Y] 13 [I] 7-12; | [A]DE102013114782 (VECOPLAN AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0003] , [0033]; figures 1,2 * | Opposition | DE2436543 | US2011272513 | DE102013114782 | - Pk Machinery Media, "Introduction of Trommel Vibrating Screen", URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=H7qYEaBOzEU, (20231228), XP093164738 |