EP3981978 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A HYDROGEN FUELLED COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Powertrain, LLC 14900 Galleon Court Plymouth MI 48170 / US | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bunce, Michael Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US | 02 /
Peters, Nathan Whitmore Lake, Michigan 48189 / US | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Gleim, Christian Ragnar Gleim Petri Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Mergentheimer Straße 36 97082 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | Gleim, Christian Ragnar Ludwigstraße 22 97070 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20200941.1 | 09.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981978 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02M21/02, F02B19/10, F02B19/12 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
F02M21/0206 (EP,US);
F02B19/108 (EP,KR,US);
F02B19/1019 (EP);
F02B19/1023 (EP);
F02B19/1057 (KR);
F02B19/12 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/0027 (KR);
F02M21/0248 (EP);
F02M21/0275 (US);
F02M21/0278 (EP);
F02P13/00 (KR);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES MIT WASSERSTOFF BETRIEBENEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2022/15] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A HYDROGEN FUELLED COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2022/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION ALIMENTÉ EN HYDROGÈNE | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 13.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2024 | Observations by third parties | 26.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9954605 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1,12* figure 3 *; | [XI]US2016348569 (KIM CHARLIE [US]) [X] 1-7,12 * paragraphs [0047] , [ 0048] , [ 0050] , [ 0055] , [ 0058]; figures 2, 3 * [I] 8-11 | by applicant | US2012103302 | US2015068489 | other | EP3901435 |