EP3982461 - MOBILE ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holzmeier, Georg 86748 Marktoffingen / DE | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20200974.2 | 09.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3982461 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/46, H01M50/247, H01M50/269, H02J7/00, H01M50/256 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
H01M10/46 (EP);
H01M50/204 (US);
H01M10/425 (US);
H01M10/441 (US);
H01M50/247 (EP);
H01M50/249 (US);
H01M50/256 (EP);
H01M50/269 (EP);
H02J50/10 (EP);
H02J7/00036 (EP);
H02J7/0024 (EP);
H02J7/0045 (EP);
H01M2010/4278 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H01M2220/30 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILER ENERGIESPEICHER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES MOBILEN ENERGIESPEICHERS | [2022/15] | English: | MOBILE ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE | [2022/15] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE MOBILE | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/15] | 21.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9839831 (P M G S N C DEI F LLI PAGANINI [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,13,15 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 32; figures 1-2 * [I] 10; | [X]EP2451001 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1,3-8,11-14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0038]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]ITVA20130023 (ALL ENERGY SYSTEMS S R L) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11,13,15 * page 5 - page 6; figure 1 *; | [A]EP3379594 (HOFMANN RAINER [DE]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]DE102018102982 (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |