EP3816699 - VERTICALLY-SHIFTING ELECTROSTATIC ACTUATOR AND OPTICAL SCANNER EMPLOYING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Optron Corp. 35 Cheomdan Venture so-ro 38beon-gil Buk-gu Gwangju 61007 / KR | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yun Goo 108-303, 25, Gwangdeokdong-ro, Danwon-gu, Ansan-si 15483 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hwan Sun 108-1006, 15, Imbangul-daero 1041beon-gil, Buk-gu 61018 Gwangju / KR | 03 /
LEE, Eun Joong 804, 60-3, Imbangul-daero 826beon-gil, Gwangsan-gu 62277 Gwangju / KR | 04 /
KIM, Yong Kook 926-206, 340, Mokdongseo-ro, Yangcheon-gu 08089 Seoul / KR | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/49] |
Former [2021/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20201230.8 | 12.10.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | KR20190136294 | 30.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190136294 | KR20190171672 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190171672 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816699 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3816699 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G02B26/0841 (EP,CN,US);
G02B26/103 (KR);
B81B3/0062 (US);
G02B26/10 (CN);
G02B26/105 (EP,US);
B81B2201/042 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERTIKAL VERSCHIEBENDER ELEKTROSTATISCHER AKTUATOR UND OPTISCHER ABTASTER MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/18] | English: | VERTICALLY-SHIFTING ELECTROSTATIC ACTUATOR AND OPTICAL SCANNER EMPLOYING THE SAME | [2021/18] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTROSTATIQUE À DÉPLACEMENT VERTICAL ET DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE OPTIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 05.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1798195 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * figures 9,10 *; | [A]US2008239429 (SANDNER THILO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-5,10 *; | [A]KR20110107154 (KWANGJU INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2012024453 (KATO TAKAHISA [JP]) [A] 1-13* figure 5 *; | [A]KR102032287B (KOREA OPTRON CORP [KR]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-8 * | by applicant | KR101090961B |