EP3805140 - ELEVATOR CAB AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hailo Wind Systems GmbH & Co. KG Kalteiche-Ring 18 35708 Haiger / DE | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weg, Johannes Zu den Aspen 31 35685 Dillenburg / DE | 02 /
Kolb, Christian Flurstraße 13 35767 Breitscheid / DE | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 20202032.7 | 17.09.2019 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | EP20180195252 | 18.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18195252 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805140 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02, B66B9/187 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B66B11/0226 (EP,CN,US);
B66B11/02 (EP);
B66B9/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGKABINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER AUFZUGKABINE | [2021/15] | English: | ELEVATOR CAB AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2021/15] | French: | CABINE D'ASCENSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 01.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19197780.0 / EP3626670 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5199530 (BIALY LOUIS [US]); | [XA]JPH11343083 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]DE102009005000 (SCHIESE CHRISTOPHER [DE], et al); | [XA]JP2012136334 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [XA]WO2015033017 (KONE CORP [FI]); | [XA]WO2017050539 (THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR AG [DE], et al) |