Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3805140
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.09.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.11.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.01.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.11.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
11.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2022 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.09.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2022 |
First examination report |
|
03.09.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
03.09.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
06.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.03.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
16.10.2020 |
Change - representative |
|