Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3805140 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18195252 | 18.09.2018 | EP19197780 | 17.09.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11634303 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2023 | B2 | US2020087114 | 19.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18195252 | 18.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3626670 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18195252 | 18.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110902528 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP18195252 | 18.09.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102019019468 | 28.07.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP18195252 | 18.09.2018 | Type | Earlier application | EP3626670 |