EP3815751 - HORIZONTAL LIFELINE SHUTTLE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 02.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOVOTNY, Josef HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 02 /
GDOVEC, Viliam HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 03 /
AUDYOVA, Marketa HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 04 /
BRADFORD, Scott Hugh HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20202160.6 | 15.10.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | US201962929587P | 01.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962929587 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3815751 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
A62B35/0081 (EP,US);
A62B35/0056 (EP,US);
A62B35/0068 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HORIZONTALE RETTUNGSLEINEN-SHUTTLE-VORRICHTUNG | [2021/18] | English: | HORIZONTAL LIFELINE SHUTTLE APPARATUS | [2021/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE NAVETTE AVEC CORDE DE SÉCURITÉ HORIZONTALE | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 02.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002050421 (LARA PASCAL [FR]); | [A]GB2389386 (DUNN & COWE LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2009133361 (LATCHWAYS PLC [GB], et al); | [A]EP3369460 (ROTHO BLAAS SRL GMBH [IT]) |