EP3809595 - ANALOG SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABLIC Inc. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-0293 / JP | [2023/26] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states ABLIC Inc. 3-9-6 Mita Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAIZUMI, Eiki c/o ABLIC Inc. 3-9-6 Mita Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 20202267.9 | 16.10.2020 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | JP20190191404 | 18.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019191404 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809595 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/06 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H03K17/063 (EP);
G06F1/08 (US);
H03K17/6872 (US);
H03K17/6874 (US);
H03K2217/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALOGER SCHALTER | [2021/16] | English: | ANALOG SWITCH | [2021/16] | French: | COMMUTATEUR ANALOGIQUE | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 28.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010214006 (HANAZAWA SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015014779 (JENNINGS JOHN K [IE], et al); | [XAI]US2016285446 (SNOWDON KENNETH P [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2012209763 |