Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
26.05.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
04.11.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
25.10.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.09.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
02.09.2022 | First examination report | |
30.04.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
30.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.04.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
30.04.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
19.03.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
16.10.2020 | Change - representative |