EP3808266 - VERIFYING PROPER WITHDRAWAL OF CATHETER INTO SHEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam, 2066717 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEECKLER, Christopher Thomas 31 Technology Drive Suite 200 Irvine, CA California 92618 / US | 02 /
OZERI, Ella c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 03 /
GOLDBERG, Aviva c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20202308.1 | 16.10.2020 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | US201916657463 | 18.10.2019 Original published format: US201916657463 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808266 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06, // A61B34/20, A61B5/00, A61B18/00, A61B17/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/062 (EP,IL);
A61B5/6869 (EP,IL);
A61M25/10187 (IL,US);
A61B17/221 (IL,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,IL);
A61B5/063 (EP,IL);
A61B5/283 (IL);
A61B5/287 (EP,IL);
A61B5/6853 (EP,IL);
A61B5/6856 (EP,IL);
A61B5/6858 (EP,IL);
A61M25/0074 (IL,US);
A61M25/10181 (IL,US);
A61M25/10188 (IL,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,IL);
A61B2017/00336 (IL,US);
A61B2017/00358 (IL,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00577 (IL,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,IL);
A61B2034/2053 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERPRÜFUNG DES KORREKTEN RÜCKZUGES EINES KATHETERS IN EINE HÜLLE | [2021/16] | English: | VERIFYING PROPER WITHDRAWAL OF CATHETER INTO SHEATH | [2021/16] | French: | VÉRIFICATION DU RETRAIT CORRECT D'UN CATHÉTER DANS UNE GAINE | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 21.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013123694 (SUBRAMANIYAN RAGHAVAN [IN], et al); | [A]US2014275991 (POTTER DANIEL J [US], et al); | [X]EP3053517 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]); | [A]EP3284404 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) | by applicant | US5391199 | WO9605768 | US5558091 | US6172499 | US6177792 | US6690963 | US6748255 | US6788967 | US6973339 | US7371232 | US8456182 | US8475450 | US2013303886 | US8600472 | US8608735 | US9050010 | US9220433 | US2017100188 | US9788893 | US9848948 |