EP3988854 - CLOSURE UNIT FOR A VENTILATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viessmann Climate Solutions SE Viessmannstrasse 1 35108 Allendorf (Eder) / DE | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Daniel 59939 Olsberg / DE | 02 /
EITZENHÖFER, Rico 59969 Bromskirchen / DE | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Clerc, Natalia Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20203051.6 | 21.10.2020 | [2022/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988854 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24F12/00, F24F13/10 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
F24F13/1426 (EP,US);
F24F12/006 (EP,US);
F24F13/10 (EP);
F24F2012/007 (US);
Y02B30/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] |
Former [2022/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSEINHEIT EINER LÜFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/17] | English: | CLOSURE UNIT FOR A VENTILATION DEVICE | [2022/17] | French: | UNITÉ DE VERROUILLAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AÉRATION | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 14.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO9706390 (TURCOTTE INC [CA]) [X] 1-3,5,8-11,15,16 * pages 3-11; figures 1-3 * [A] 4,7,12-14 [I] 6; | [A]DE202012010671U (LTG AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XA]KR101263656B (DAELIM IND CO LTD [KR]) [X] 9,10,12,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0038]; figures 1a-7b *[A] 11,13-15; | [XAI]EP3260793 (LUNOS LÜFTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH FÜR RAUMLUFTSYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1-5,8 * paragraphs [0019] , [0026] , [0051] - [0056]; figures 2a, 2b * [A] 7 [I] 6 | by applicant | EP0044560 | EP1132690 | US2007158049 | EP1962031 | DE102011114885 | DE102013216306 | EP2498014 |