05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
15.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
28.04.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
09.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
20.05.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
17.05.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.05.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.05.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.02.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.09.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
11.06.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
23.10.2020 |
Change - representative |
|