Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11433789 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2022 | B2 | US2021122271 | 29.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019129159 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112744130B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2023 | B | CN112744130 | 04.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019129159 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3815961 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2022 | B1 | EP3815961 | 05.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019129159 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102019129159 | 02.05.2024 | B4 | DE102019129159 | 29.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019129159 | 29.10.2019 |