Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11654799 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2023 | B2 | US2021122265 | 29.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019129162 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112744132B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2023 | B | CN112744132 | 04.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019129162 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3815963 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019129162 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102019129162 | 02.11.2023 | B4 | DE102019129162 | 29.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019129162 | 29.10.2019 |