Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11920988 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B2 | US2021123822 | 29.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI20195922 | 28.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3819616 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2024 | B1 | EP3819616 | 12.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI20195922 | 28.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI129727B | 15.08.2022 | B | FI20195922 | 29.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI20195922 | 28.10.2019 |