EP3790302 - EXCHANGE OF SCHEDULING STRATEGIES FOR INTERFERENCE COORDINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wireless Future Technologies Inc. 1891 Robertson Road, Suite 100 Ottawa, ON K2H 5B7 / CA | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUSE, Jörn Freibergstr. 28-30 12107 Berlin / DE | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Klaus Ingemann Bernstorffsgade 18B 9000 Aalborg / DK | 03 /
VIERING, Ingo Kaspar-Spaet-Strasse 11 81549 Munich / DE | [2021/17] |
Former [2021/10] | 01 /
KRAUSE, Jörn Freibergstr. 28-30 12107 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
PEDERSEN, Klaus Ingemann Laesogade 9, 3 th 9000 Aalborg / DK | |||
03 /
VIERING, Ingo Werinherstrasse 95b 81541 Munchen / DE | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20203776.8 | 22.08.2008 | [2021/10] | Priority number, date | US20070957331P | 22.08.2007 Original published format: US 957331 P | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790302 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/10, // H04W72/27, H04W72/541 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H04W16/10 (EP,US);
H04W72/27 (EP,US);
H04W72/541 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | H04W16/10, // H04W72/04, H04W72/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUSTAUSCH VON PLANUNGSSTRATEGIEN ZUR INTERFERENZKOORDINIERUNG | [2021/10] | English: | EXCHANGE OF SCHEDULING STRATEGIES FOR INTERFERENCE COORDINATION | [2021/10] | French: | ÉCHANGE DE STRATÉGIES DE PROGRAMME POUR COORDINATION D'INTERFÉRENCE | [2021/10] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 10.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08787425.1 / EP2193677 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 12.06.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.12.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0654952 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [X]EP1786221 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |