EP3836011 - LIVENESS TEST METHOD AND LIVENESS TEST APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, SEUNGJU Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, BYUNG KWAN Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, JONG-SOK Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
CHOI, SUNGDO Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 20203797.4 | 26.10.2020 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | KR20190165777 | 12.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190165777 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836011 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (KR);
G06V40/45 (CN);
G01S13/04 (CN,US);
G01S13/867 (US);
G01S13/88 (CN);
G01S7/024 (US);
G01S7/412 (US);
G06F21/45 (KR);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V40/16 (KR);
G06V40/161 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECHTHEITSTESTVERFAHREN UND ECHTHEITSTESTVORRICHTUNG | [2021/24] | English: | LIVENESS TEST METHOD AND LIVENESS TEST APPARATUS | [2021/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TEST DE L'ACTIVITÉ | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 16.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3382598 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] *; | [Y]US2019187265 (BARBELLO BRANDON [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0036] ** paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * |