EP3816806 - UTILIZING NEURAL NETWORK AND ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE MODELS TO SELECT AND EXECUTE TEST CASES IN A SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Solutions Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YALLA, Muralidhar B115, Mahaveer Marvel Apartment Kodichikkanahalli 560076 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
VIJENDRA, Anand 3423/A 1st F Cross R.P.C. Layout Vijayanagar 560040 Bangalore / IN | 03 /
RAMAKRISHNAN, Venugopal Accenture 1 Plantation Place London, EC3M 3BD / GB | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 20203986.3 | 27.10.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | US201916667255 | 29.10.2019 Original published format: US201916667255 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816806 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3816806 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/126, G06N20/00, G06N5/01, G06F11/36 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G06F11/3688 (EP,US);
G06F11/3664 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/126 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06F11/3684 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | G06F11/36, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON NEURONALEN NETZWERK- UND KÜNSTLICHEN INTELLIGENZMODELLEN ZUR AUSWAHL UND AUSFÜHRUNG VON TESTFÄLLEN IN EINER SOFTWARE-ENTWICKLUNGSPLATTFORM | [2021/18] | English: | UTILIZING NEURAL NETWORK AND ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE MODELS TO SELECT AND EXECUTE TEST CASES IN A SOFTWARE DEVELOPMENT PLATFORM | [2021/18] | French: | UTILISATION DE MODÈLES DE RÉSEAU NEURAL ET D'INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE POUR SÉLECTIONNER ET EXÉCUTER DES CAS DE TEST DANS UNE PLATEFORME DE DÉVELOPPEMENT DE LOGICIEL | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | IT | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | LU | 27.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
LU | 27.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
LU | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
IT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ANDERSON C ET AL, "ON THE USE OF NEURAL NETWORKS TO GUIDE SOFTWARE TESTING ACTIVITIES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE (ITC). WASHINGTON, OCT. 21 - 25, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE (ITC)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19951021), doi:10.1109/TEST.1995.529902, ISBN 978-0-7803-2992-8, pages 720 - 729, XP000552875 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 720, column lc, paragraph 1 - page 721, column lc, paragraph 1 * * page 722, left-hand column, section 2.2, paragraph 1 - right-hand column, paragraph 1 * * page 725, column rc, paragraph 1 - page 726, column rc, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TEST.1995.529902 | [I] - HELGE SPIEKER ET AL, "Reinforcement Learning for Automatic Test Case Prioritization and Selection in Continuous Integration", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20181109), doi:10.1145/3092703.3092709, XP081048480 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, column rc, paragraph 1 - page 2, column rc, paragraph 2 * * page 6, left-hand column, section 4.2 paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3092703.3092709 | [A] - Anonymous, "Artificial neural network", (20191028), pages 1 - 13, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Artificial_neural_network&oldid=923454359, (20210218), XP055777313 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Dynamic program analysis", (20191016), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Dynamic_program_analysis&oldid=921483059, (20210218), XP055777316 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Execution model", (20190908), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Execution_model&oldid=914580876, (20210217), XP055776941 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | - Voges Udo ET AL, "SADAT-An Automated Testing Tool", ACM Sigplan Notices Information Proc. Lett. IEEE Trans. Comput. IEEE Trans. Software Eng. Software-Practice and Experience J. C. Huang ACM Computing Surveys, (19800503), pages 457 - 463, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stampPDF/getPDF.jsp?tp=&arnumber=1702730&ref=aHR0cHM6Ly9pZWVleHBsb3JlLmllZWUub3JnL2Fic3RyYWN0L2RvY3VtZW50LzE3MDI3MzA=, (20230112), XP093013465 |