EP3991529 - DEVICE FOR GROUND WORKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hochschule Weihenstephan-Triesdorf Am Hofgarten 4 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurz, Hariolf 91746 Weidenbach / DE | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Koplin, Moritz Anne-Conway-Straße 1 28359 Bremen / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20204225.5 | 28.10.2020 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991529 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01B21/02, A01B35/26, A01B31/00, A01B21/04, A01B23/02, A01B25/00, A01B35/08, A01B35/14, E02F9/28 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
A01B21/02 (EP);
A01B31/00 (EP);
A01B35/26 (EP);
E02F9/2858 (EP);
A01B21/04 (EP);
A01B23/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | A01B21/02, A01B35/26, E02F9/28, A01B31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT FÜR BODENARBEITEN | [2022/18] | English: | DEVICE FOR GROUND WORKING | [2022/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAVAIL AU SOL | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 11.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US86893 ; | [X]US226531 ; | [X]US1275588 (MYERS FREDERICK H [US]); | [X]US2751736 (HESSEMER ROBERT R); | [AD]WO2014139733 (BETEK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]DE102015122620 (BETEK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [X]US2018171587 (PARZYNSKI JR DAVID BRUNO [US], et al); | [X]CN108605445 (ZHANG WEI); | [X]DE102018108734 (JANSEN THOMAS [DE]) |