Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024091523 | ![]() | 21.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715589366 | 08.05.2017 | US202318506521 | 10.11.2023 | US201816026995 | 03.07.2018 | US202217741794 | 11.05.2022 | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | US202017083467 | 29.10.2020 | US202017013066 | 04.09.2020 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201414401096 | 13.11.2014 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9675740 | ![]() | 13.06.2017 | B2 | US2016243295 | 25.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201414401096 | 13.11.2014 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9327067 | ![]() | 03.05.2016 | B2 | US2015099922 | 09.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201314401096 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11850413 | ![]() | 26.12.2023 | B2 | US2022280770 | 08.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715589366 | 08.05.2017 | US201816026995 | 03.07.2018 | US202217741794 | 11.05.2022 | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | US202017083467 | 29.10.2020 | US202017013066 | 04.09.2020 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201414401096 | 13.11.2014 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11357967 | ![]() | 14.06.2022 | B2 | US2021038787 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715589366 | 08.05.2017 | US201816026995 | 03.07.2018 | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | US202017083467 | 29.10.2020 | US202017013066 | 04.09.2020 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201414401096 | 13.11.2014 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11311712 | ![]() | 26.04.2022 | B2 | US2021038789 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715589366 | 08.05.2017 | US201816026995 | 03.07.2018 | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | US202017083505 | 29.10.2020 | US202017013066 | 04.09.2020 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11260213 | ![]() | 01.03.2022 | B2 | US2021038788 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715589366 | 08.05.2017 | US201816026995 | 03.07.2018 | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | US202017083503 | 29.10.2020 | US202017013066 | 04.09.2020 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11229786 | ![]() | 25.01.2022 | B2 | US2020397961 | 24.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715589366 | 08.05.2017 | US201816026995 | 03.07.2018 | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | US202017013066 | 04.09.2020 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10765789 | ![]() | 08.09.2020 | B2 | US2018311423 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715589366 | 08.05.2017 | US201816026995 | 03.07.2018 | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201414401096 | 13.11.2014 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10039872 | ![]() | 07.08.2018 | B2 | US2017239406 | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715589366 | 08.05.2017 | US201615142522 | 29.04.2016 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201414401096 | 13.11.2014 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4218887 | ![]() | 02.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13790363 | 13.05.2013 | EP20204760 | 13.05.2013 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3799916 | ![]() | 12.03.2025 | B1 | EP3799916 | 21.07.2021 | A3 | EP3799916 | 07.04.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP13790363 | 13.05.2013 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3799915 | ![]() | 07.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13790363 | 13.05.2013 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2849813 | ![]() | 30.12.2020 | B1 | EP2849813 | 10.02.2016 | A4 | EP2849813 | 25.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3799914 | ![]() | 07.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13790363 | 13.05.2013 | WO2013US40809 | 13.05.2013 | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013173245 | ![]() | 21.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8721517 | ![]() | 13.05.2014 | B2 | US2013303830 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013008168 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2504176 | 22.01.2014 | A | GB201308563D0 | 19.06.2013 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US201261646827 | 14.05.2012 | US201261667875 | 03.07.2012 | US201313802570 | 13.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | EP4218887 | Type | ![]() | EP2849813 |