EP3819554 - VENTILATION DEVICE FOR VENTILATION OF A LIVING SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Str. 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoop, Thomas Wacholderweg 1 35510 Butzbach / DE | 02 /
Billek, Ramon Lange Str. 58 42857 Remscheid / DE | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Popp, Carsten Vaillant GmbH IRP Berghauser Straße 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 20205190.0 | 02.11.2020 | [2021/19] | Priority number, date | DE201910130219 | 08.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019130219 | [2021/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819554 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3819554 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/28, F24F12/00, F24F7/08 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
F24F7/08 (EP);
F24F12/006 (EP);
F24F13/28 (EP);
Y02B30/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | F24F13/28, F24F12/00, // F24F7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LÜFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR LÜFTUNG EINES WOHNRAUMS | [2021/19] | English: | VENTILATION DEVICE FOR VENTILATION OF A LIVING SPACE | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À L'AÉRATION D'UN ESPACE HABITABLE | [2021/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 10.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | LU | 02.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 02.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003150196 (DUFFY DEAN R [US]) [X] 1,3-5,11,13,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0016]; figures 5, 6 * [I] 2,6-10,12,14; | [A]WO2013015595 (KYUNGDONG NAVIEN CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2014096494 (WISER III FORWOOD C [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10,12,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0014] - [0016]; figures 1-3, 7a-7c * [I] 2,6-9,11,13,14; | [XI]DE202014010049U (POLLMEIER THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1-6,10,15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0027] , [0030] , [0031]; figures 1-4 * [I] 7-9,11-14 |