EP3819432 - CLEARING BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fliegl Agro-Center GmbH Maierhof 1 84556 Kastl / DE | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fliegl sen., Josef Maierhof 1 84556 Kastl / DE | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Nußbaum, Christopher Patentanwaltskanzlei Nußbaum Marktler Straße 15 B 84489 Burghausen / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 20205662.8 | 04.11.2020 | [2021/19] | Priority number, date | DE201910129981 | 06.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019129981 | [2021/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819432 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3819432 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/06 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
E01H5/061 (EP);
E01H5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RÄUMSCHILD | [2021/19] | English: | CLEARING BLADE | [2021/19] | French: | LAME DÉBROUSSAILLEUSE | [2021/19] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 12.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | MC | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 20.12.2023 | |
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3413738 (GOLDBERG LEWIS B) [A] 1-7* column 2, lines 19-56 *; | [Y]EP0592262 (PELAZZA GIANDOMENICO [IT]) [Y] 2 * columns 1,2 *; | [XY]DE202011050562U (FIEDLER MASCHB UND TECHNIKVERTRIEB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0021]; figure 1 * [Y] 2 |