EP3995370 - A VEHICLE MOTION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND A MOTION SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARIKERE, Adithya 412 75 GÖTEBORG / SE | 02 /
SIDHANT, Ray 417 13 GÖTEBORG / SE | 03 /
LAINE, Leo 438 94 HÄRRYDA / SE | 04 /
HENDERSON, Leon 438 92 HÄRRYDA / SE | 05 /
ÅSBOGÅRD, Mattias 435 35 MÖLNLYCKE / SE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20205699.0 | 04.11.2020 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995370 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/1761, B60T8/175, B60W30/18, B60W10/184, B60W10/08 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B60T8/17616 (EP);
B60L15/20 (KR);
B60W30/18172 (CN,US);
B60T8/175 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,CN);
B60W40/101 (US);
B60W40/105 (KR);
B60W60/001 (KR);
G06F9/30003 (KR);
B60L2240/461 (KR);
B60L2240/465 (KR);
B60L2250/28 (KR);
B60W2300/12 (CN,US);
B60W2520/26 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2520/28 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2520/30 (EP);
B60W2720/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] |
Former [2022/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGBEWEGUNGSMANAGEMENTSYSTEM UND BEWEGUNGSUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2022/19] | English: | A VEHICLE MOTION MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND A MOTION SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE | [2022/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE MOUVEMENT DE VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE MOUVEMENT POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 08.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5275474 (CHIN YUEN-KWOK [US], et al) [A] 1,13* column 9, line 63 - column 11, line 65; figures 12, 13 *; | [YA]WO2014184344 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]) [Y] 6,10-16 * page 30, line 8 - page 30, line 35; claims 1-30 * [A] 4; | [XDAYI]WO2017215751 (VOLVO TRUCK CORP [SE]) [XD] 1,2,5,10 * page 20, line 7 - page 22, line 2; figure 5 * * page 11, line 30 - page 17, line 9 * [A] 4 [Y] 6,10-16 [I] 3,7-9; | [A]US2019322256 (THA INGO [DE]) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | WO2017215751 |