EP3792338 - HARD SURFACE CLEANERS INCLUDING FLUOROSURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C.JOHNSON & SON, INC. 1525 Howe Street Racine, WI 53403 / US | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merritt, Colleen M. 3026 Fenceline Road Racine, WI Wisconsin 53406 / US | 02 /
Lynch, Loretta G. 205 4 1/2 Mile Road Racine, WI Wisconsin 53402 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20205898.8 | 27.11.2017 | [2021/11] | Priority number, date | US201662426672P | 28.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662426672 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792338 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/00, C11D3/04, C11D3/30, C11D3/20, C11D11/00, C11D17/00, C11D3/24, C11D1/14 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
C11D1/004 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (US);
C11D1/006 (US);
C11D1/28 (US);
C11D17/0008 (EP,US);
C11D3/044 (EP,US);
C11D3/20 (EP,US);
C11D3/2003 (US);
C11D3/2006 (EP,US);
C11D3/2041 (US);
C11D3/2044 (US);
C11D3/2068 (EP,US);
C11D3/245 (EP,US);
C11D3/30 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REINIGER FÜR HARTE OBERFLÄCHEN MIT FLUORHALTIGEN TENSIDEN | [2021/11] | English: | HARD SURFACE CLEANERS INCLUDING FLUOROSURFACTANTS | [2021/11] | French: | PRODUITS NETTOYANTS DE SURFACES DURES COMPRENANT DES TENSIOACTIFS FLUORÉS | [2021/11] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17808733.4 / EP3545061 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2166153 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [Y] 1-13 * example 1; claims 1-6; tables 1-3 * * page 1, lines 7-8, 49-65 * * page 2, lines 4-11 * * page 3, lines 34-41, 54, 55 * * page 4, lines 20-37, 52-55 * [A] 14,15; | [Y]WO9730140 (STEPAN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * examples 4a-4c, 4e, 5-9 *; | [Y]WO2009105453 (JOHNSON DIVERSEY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * example 1 *; | [Y] - Steffen Schellenberger, Jörg Pahnke, Reiner Friedrich, Gerhard Jonschler, "A new Generation of High-Speed Fluorosurfactants", Darmstadt, Germany, (20150501), Merck KGaA, URL: https://www.pcimag.com/articles/97759-a-new-generation-of-high-speed-fluorosurfactants, (20180124), XP002777640 [Y] 1-13 * page 2 - page 5, paragraph 3 * | [A] - Anonymous, "DuPont Capstone FS-65 fluorosurfactant", (2011), page 2PP, Du Pont Chemicals and Fluoroproducts, URL: http://www2.dupont.com/Capstone/en_US/assets/downloads/Capstone_FS65_TDS_K23568_Capstone_FS-65_07march2011.pdf, (20180125), XP002777641 [A] 1-15 * page 1 * | [A] - Anonymous, "DuPont Capstone FS-10 fluorosurfactant", (2008), page 2PP, Du Pont, URL: https://www.chemours.com/Capstone/en_US/assets/downloads/capstone_fs_10.pdf, (20180125), XP002777642 [A] 1-15 * page 1 * | [A] - Anonymous, "DuPont Capstone fluorosurfactants- high value in use applications that require maximum performance", (20141004), pages 1 - 8, Du Pont, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20141004100142/http://www2.dupont.com/Capstone/en_US/assets/downloads/DuPont(TM)_Capstone(R)_Fluorosurfactants_Brochure_K-24287.pdf, (20180123), XP002777639 [A] 1-15 * pages 3, 6-7; figure 2 * |