EP3820052 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS FOR SCHEDULING TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comcast Cable Communications LLC 1701 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRIK, Ali Cagatay c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US | 02 /
DINAN, Esmael c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US | 03 /
YI, Yunjung c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, Hua c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 20205972.1 | 05.11.2020 | [2021/19] | Priority number, date | US201962930803P | 05.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962930803 P | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3820052 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0408, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, // H04W72/04 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04W72/1273 (US);
H04B7/0408 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/189 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/0092 (US);
H04L5/0094 (US);
H04W72/231 (US);
H04W72/232 (US);
H04L1/1671 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] |
Former [2021/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONEN ZUR PLANUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2021/19] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS FOR SCHEDULING TRANSMISSIONS | [2021/19] | French: | COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL POUR PROGRAMMER DES TRANSMISSIONS | [2021/19] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 12.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Enhancements on multi-TRP/panel transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, (20191005), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1910073, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1910073.zip R1-1910073.doc, (20191005), XP051808411 [X] 1-5,8-11,13-15 * Sections 2.3 and 3.3 * [I] 6,7,12 |