EP3995009 - A RECHARGEABLE AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAIR, Kyle Lisburn, Country Antrim BT28 2UW / GB | 02 /
POPOOLA, Olayiwola Olamiposi Walton-on-Thames, KT12 2SJ / GB | 03 /
LOVEDAY, Peter Woking, Surrey GU24 9PW / GB | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20206241.0 | 06.11.2020 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995009 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/90, A24F40/40, A24F40/53 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A24F40/90 (EP);
A24F40/40 (EP);
A24F40/53 (EP);
H02J50/005 (EP);
H02J50/10 (EP);
H02J2207/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERAUFLADBARE AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | A RECHARGEABLE AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE | [2022/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL RECHARGEABLE | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015137815 (KYRIAKOPOULOS DIMITRI [NL]) [A] 1-7* page 3, line 27 - line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [IY]US2018301915 (COLOTTE GUILLAUME [CH], et al) [I] 7 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046] * [Y] 3-5; | [A]CN208080540U (ZHANG YU, et al) [A] 1-7 * See translation "Example 1";; figures 1,6 *; | [IY]CN209219253U (SHENZHEN INNOKIN TECH CO LTD) [I] 1,2,6 * See translation "Detailed ways";; figure 2 * [Y] 3-5 |