EP3832100 - GEARED GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place, 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spruce, Mark c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20206408.5 | 09.11.2020 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | GB20190017766 | 05.12.2019 Original published format: GB 201917766 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832100 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/36, F16H1/28 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
F02C7/36 (EP,CN,US);
F16H1/32 (CN);
F02C3/04 (CN);
F16H1/2809 (EP);
F16H3/70 (CN);
F16H57/023 (CN);
F16H57/025 (EP,CN);
F16H57/08 (CN,US);
F16H57/082 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASTURBINE MIT GETRIEBE | [2021/23] | English: | GEARED GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2021/23] | French: | TURBINE À GAZ AVEC UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013336791 (MCCUNE MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0025] , [ 0026] , [ 0040] , [ 0041]; figures 1-8 * [I] 3,5,7-9,11,12,14; | [XI]US2017342858 (MCCUNE MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0025]; figures 1-8 * [I] 3,5,7-9,11,12,14; | [A]US10436035 (BARALON STEPHANE M M [GB], et al) [A] 12 * column 3, line 32 - line 41 * * column 5, line 4 - line 18 ** column 8, line 29 - line 42 *; | [A]US2019316488 (MENCZYKALSKI STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 3,8,10,11 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0022] , [ 0023] , [ 0090] *; | [A]US2019345876 (GOUMAS ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 12 * figure 4A * |