EP4001774 - SYSTEM FOR RECORDING A PHYSICAL PROPERTY AND COOKER HOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AKTIEBOLAG S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUßE, Constantin 91541 Rothenburg o. d. Tauber / DE | 02 /
MAZZON, Claudio 91541 Rothenburg / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20206874.8 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001774 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20, F24C7/08, F24C15/10, A47J36/00, G01K11/26 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
F24C15/2021 (EP);
G05D23/1917 (US);
A47J36/321 (US);
A47J36/38 (US);
F24C15/105 (EP);
F24C3/126 (US);
F24C7/083 (EP,US);
F24C7/087 (EP);
G01K1/024 (US);
G01K11/265 (EP,US);
F24C15/20 (US);
G01K2207/02 (US);
G01K2207/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERFASSUNG EINER PHYSIKALISCHEN EIGENSCHAFT UND DUNSTHAUBE | [2022/21] | English: | SYSTEM FOR RECORDING A PHYSICAL PROPERTY AND COOKER HOOD | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENREGISTREMENT D'UNE PROPRIÉTÉ PHYSIQUE ET HOTTE DE CUISINIÈRE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 25.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3811925 ; | [A]DE10208468 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [A]US2013171304 (HUNTLEY ROBERT E [US]); | [A]EP2894816 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2016374501 (LOGAN JAMES D [US], et al); | [XI]WO2017143224 (MEYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES LTD [CN], et al); | [X]WO2018024913 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [X]US2018073744 (JI SOOK-YOUNG [KR], et al); | [A]US2018116437 (ARMSTRONG JAMES LEE [US]); | [X]CN207575007U (WUXI SHANGZHIQIAO NETWORK TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2018224127 (LAMBERT NATHANIEL A [US], et al); | [X]EP3489584 (EGO ELEKTRO GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]); | [X]US10810860 (EUBANKS DANA [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2012159865 |