EP3822160 - FIN STABILISER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKF Marine GmbH Hermann-Blohm-Straße 5 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spardel, Holger Levisohnweg 2 22081 Hamburg / DE | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Kuhstrebe, Jochen SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Straße 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 20206914.2 | 11.11.2020 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | DE201910217749 | 18.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019217749 | [2021/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822160 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822160 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63B39/06 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B63B39/06 (EP);
B63B2039/067 (EP);
B63B2039/068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLOSSENSTABILISATOR | [2021/20] | English: | FIN STABILISER | [2021/20] | French: | STABILISATEUR D'AILETTES | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 10.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]EP2565116 (BLOHM & VOSS IND GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-6 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0008] , [ 0014] *[I] 7 | by applicant | EP2565116 |