EP3822209 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM WITH MESH NETWORK HAVING PROXY-TRANSCEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUENZI, Adam 4001 Fairview Industrial Dr. SE Salem, OR 97302-1142 / US | 02 /
KLOPFENSTEIN, Troy 4001 Fairview Industrial Dr. SE Salem, OR 97302-1142 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 20206972.0 | 11.11.2020 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | US201962937210P | 18.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962937210 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822209 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/34, // B66B5/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B66B1/3446 (EP);
B66B1/3461 (US);
B66B1/3453 (US);
B66B1/3492 (US);
B66B1/52 (US);
B66B3/008 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/80 (US);
B66B5/0087 (EP);
H04L67/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSSYSTEM MIT MESH-NETZWERK MIT PROXY-SENDER-EMPFÄNGER | [2021/20] | English: | ELEVATOR SYSTEM WITH MESH NETWORK HAVING PROXY-TRANSCEIVER | [2021/20] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASCENSEUR DOTÉ D'UN RÉSEAU MAILLÉ AVEC ÉMETTEUR-RÉCEPTEUR PROXY | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 18.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1103510 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010012639 (INVENTIO AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2015251875 (LUSTENBERGER IVO [CH]) [X] 1-3,6,9-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 29] , [0 52] , [0 73] - [0078] * * figure 1 * [A] 5,7,8,12 [I] 4,15; | [XAI]US2019210837 (HERKEL PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10,13,14 * paragraphs [0033] - [0069] * * figure 1 * [A] 4-8,11,12 [I] 15 |