EP3825672 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR PROVIDING FREEZE RESISTANT SENSING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHAT, Lokesha HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 02 /
THANIGACHALAM, Palani HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 03 /
KRISHNA N K, Vijaya HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 04 /
S, Vijayakumar HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 05 /
SHANBHOGUE, Shridhara HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/52] |
Former [2021/21] | 01 /
BHAT, Lokesha HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | ||
02 /
THANIGACHALAM, Palani HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | |||
03 /
KRISHNA N K, Vijaya HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202us / US | |||
04 /
S, Vijayakumar HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | |||
05 /
SHANBHOGUE, Shridhara HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2023/45] |
Former [2021/21] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20207037.1 | 11.11.2020 | [2021/21] | Priority number, date | US201916689933 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: US201916689933 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825672 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3825672 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/00, G01L19/06, G01L19/14 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
G01L19/0645 (EP,US);
G01L19/0046 (CN);
G01L9/0044 (US);
G01L19/0038 (EP);
G01L19/0618 (EP,CN);
G01L19/0636 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER FROSTSICHEREN SENSORANORDNUNG | [2021/21] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR PROVIDING FREEZE RESISTANT SENSING ASSEMBLY | [2021/21] | French: | MÉTHODE ET DISPOSITIFS POUR FOURNIR UN AGENCEMENT DE CAPTEURS À L'ÉPREUVE DU GEL | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 24.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23195262.3 / EP4261516 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | MC | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | LU | 11.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
IT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SK | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
LU | 11.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
LU | 11.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
LU | 11.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016054192 (KACHENKO NATASHA V [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * figure 3 * [I] 7-11,13-15; | [A]WO2018186107 (SAGINOMIYA SEISAKUSHO INC [JP]) [A] 7,8,11,15 * paragraphs [0033] , [ 0034] * * figure 1 *; | [A]CN110017939 (PETROCHINA CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 1 * |