EP3932327 - NEGATIVE PRESSURE WOUND CLOSURE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts Office of General Counsel One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2022/01] | For all designated states University Of Massachusetts Office of General Counsel One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, Massachusetts 02108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNN, Raymond M. Shrewsbury, MA Massachusetts 01545 / US | [2022/01] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20207196.5 | 03.02.2012 | [2022/01] | Priority number, date | US201161439525P | 04.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161439525 P | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3932327 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/03, A61F13/00, A61M1/00, A61B17/08 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/08 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/00 (RU);
A61F13/05 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0057 (CN,US);
A61M1/08 (RU);
A61M1/84 (EP,CN,RU);
A61M1/90 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61B2017/00561 (CN,US);
A61B2017/00654 (CN,US);
A61B2017/081 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00174 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00536 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/0054 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00544 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00548 (EP,CN,US);
A61M1/916 (EP,CN,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] |
Former [2022/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNTERDRUCKWUNDVERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/01] | English: | NEGATIVE PRESSURE WOUND CLOSURE DEVICE | [2022/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE DE PLAIE PAR PRESSION NÉGATIVE | [2022/01] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2021 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.05.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 05.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12741902.6 / EP2670312 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005209574 (BOEHRINGER JOHN R [US], et al); | [X]US2010160876 (ROBINSON TIMOTHY MARK [GB], et al) | by applicant | US2009093550 |