EP3832233 - DOMESTIC REFRIGERATING DEVICE WITH A REAR FITTING PART AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE DOMESTIC REFRIGERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krauß, Harald Mohlstr. 37 73431 Aalen / DE | 02 /
Werts, Thomas Altwasserstraße 27 89293 Kellmünz / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 20207245.0 | 12.11.2020 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | DE201910219105 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019219105 | [2021/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832233 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3832233 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/06, F25D29/00 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
F25D29/006 (EP);
F25D11/00 (CN);
F25D23/066 (CN);
F25D2400/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSKÄLTEGERÄT MIT EINEM HINTERLEGTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DES HAUSHALTSKÄLTEGERÄTES | [2021/23] | English: | DOMESTIC REFRIGERATING DEVICE WITH A REAR FITTING PART AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE DOMESTIC REFRIGERATING DEVICE | [2021/23] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR ÉLECTROMÉNAGER DOTÉ D'UNE PIÈCE DE SUPPORT ARRIÈRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE RÉFRIGÉRATEUR ÉLECTROMÉNAGER | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0892230 (BSH FABRICACION SA [ES]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1-4 *[I] 2-7,9-13; | [XI]DE102011116147 (LIEBHERR HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1-3 * [I] 2-7,9-13; | [XI]DE202012012503U (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1-7 * [I] 2-7,9-13; | [XI]DE102013224260 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1-6 * [I] 2-7,9-13; | [XI]DE102014225245 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-7,9-13 | by applicant | DE102006040374 |