EP3845208 - INTRAORAL ORTHOSIS FOR PREVENTING SNORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed SAS Parc Technologique de Lyon 292 allée Jacques Monod 69791 Saint Priest Cedex / FR | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mousselon, Philipe Le Cher 826 route de Grenadières 69210 Saint Germain sur l'Abresie / FR | 02 /
Baratier, Ludovic 162 chemin de Eaux 69270 Cailloux-sur-Fontaines / FR | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 20207814.3 | 25.10.2002 | [2021/27] | Priority number, date | FR20010013918 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0113918 | [2021/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3845208 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3845208 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/56 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
A61F5/566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | INTERORALE ORTHESE ZUM VERHINDERN DES SCHNARCHENS | [2021/27] | English: | INTRAORAL ORTHOSIS FOR PREVENTING SNORING | [2021/27] | French: | ORTHÈSE INTRA-ORALE ANTI-RONFLEMENT | [2021/27] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 07.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02795347.0 / EP1446077 | EP18200205.5 / EP3482727 | EP20176611.0 | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2021 | CZ | 08.12.2021 | DK | 08.12.2021 | EE | 08.12.2021 | ES | 08.12.2021 | FI | 08.12.2021 | IT | 08.12.2021 | NL | 08.12.2021 | SE | 08.12.2021 | SK | 08.12.2021 | BG | 08.03.2022 | GR | 09.03.2022 | PT | 08.04.2022 | [2023/27] |
Former [2022/46] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 08.12.2021 | |
ES | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 08.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6012920 (WOO STEPHEN Y Y [CA]) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 9; figures 1,5; claim 1 *; | [A]DE29506512U (ERKODENT ERICH KOPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20102432U (HINZ VERWALTUNGS UND BETEILIGU [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US4472139 (ROSENBERG FAREL A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |