EP3848867 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VERIFYING THE CONTENTS OF A SHIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED PARCEL SERVICE OF AMERICA, INC. 55 Glenlake Parkway, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBER, Jim 55 Glenlake Parkway N.E. Atlanta, GA Georgia 30328 / US | 02 /
COOPER, Jeffrey A. 55 Glenlake Parkway N.E Atlanta, GA Georgia 30328 / US | 03 /
SCHENKEN, Christopher T. 120 Westchester Way Alparetta, GA Georgia 30005 / US | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20207863.0 | 18.03.2016 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | US201562135083P | 18.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562135083 P | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848867 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G06Q10/083 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/001 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PRÜFUNG DES INHALTS EINER FRACHT | [2021/28] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR VERIFYING THE CONTENTS OF A SHIPMENT | [2021/28] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE VÉRIFIER LE CONTENU D'UN ENVOI | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 22.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16713247.1 / EP3271879 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007056420 (PASSPORT SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * example implementation of a shipment verification system using X-ray; page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 3 *; | [A]US7689465 (SHAKES JONATHAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 10, line 54 - column 12, line 38; figure 3A *; | [A]EP2270547 (SIEMENS INDUSTRY INC [US]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]WO2013036735 (RAPISCAN SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |