EP4001235 - FREEZE PROTECTED WATER-BASED DISPERSION ADHESIVE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benighaus, Tobias 48165 Münster / DE | 02 /
Overkamp, Bernd 48612 Horstmar / DE | 03 /
Carl, Wilfried 8820 Wädenswil / CH | 04 /
Duhamel, Al Massachusetts 02721 / US | 05 /
Scuderi, Michael Massachusetts 02062 / US | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 20208179.0 | 17.11.2020 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001235 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4001235 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C04B7/00, C09J133/04 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
C09J133/04 (EP);
C09J133/08 (US);
B32B37/1284 (US);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B28/06 (EP);
C04B28/145 (EP);
C09J11/04 (US);
C09J11/06 (US);
C09J7/30 (US);
E04D5/148 (US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
B32B2419/06 (US);
C04B2103/0065 (EP);
C04B2111/00482 (EP);
C04B2111/00637 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/06, C04B7/02, C04B14/28, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B22/124, C04B22/143, C04B24/02, C04B24/04, C04B24/06, C04B24/2641, C04B24/2641, C04B40/065, C04B2103/20, C04B2103/67 (EP);
C04B28/145, C04B7/02, C04B7/32, C04B14/28, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B22/124, C04B24/02, C04B24/04, C04B24/06, C04B24/2641, C04B24/2641, C04B40/065, C04B2103/20, C04B2103/67 (EP);
C09J133/04, C08K3/10, C08K5/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEFRIERGESCHÜTZTER WASSERBASIERTER DISPERSIONSKLEBSTOFF UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2022/21] | English: | FREEZE PROTECTED WATER-BASED DISPERSION ADHESIVE AND USE THEREOF | [2022/21] | French: | ADHÉSIF À DISPERSION AQUEUSE PROTÉGÉ CONTRE LE GEL ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 25.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10150600 (PCI AUGSBURG GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP3233752 (SAINT-GOBAIN WEBER GMBH [DE]); | [XY]WO2019210965 (SIKA TECH AG [CH]) | by applicant | US4238378 | EP0490191 | EP0620243 | DE19801892 | US2005014881 |