Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023162853 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815747696 | 25.01.2018 | US202217875004 | 27.07.2022 | WO2016GB52271 | 25.07.2016 | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11482327 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B2 | US2018214122 | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016GB52271 | 25.07.2016 | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6847943B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2021 | B2 | JP2018528041 | 27.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016GB52271 | 25.07.2016 | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3328279 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2020 | B1 | EP3328279 | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016GB52271 | 25.07.2016 | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114521896B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2024 | B | CN114521896 | 24.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201680053526 | 25.07.2016 | CN202210142786 | 25.07.2016 | WO2016GB52271 | 25.07.2016 | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108024769B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2022 | B | CN108024769 | 11.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016GB52271 | 25.07.2016 | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2993156 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016GB52271 | 25.07.2016 | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3834726 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2023 | B1 | EP3834726 | 11.08.2021 | A3 | EP3834726 | 16.06.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP16744501 | 25.07.2016 | WO2016GB52271 | 25.07.2016 | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017017426 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201513208D0 | 09.09.2015 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201513208 | 27.07.2015 | Type | Earlier application | EP3328279 |