EP4001673 - METHOD FOR JOINING A FASTENER TO A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gramsch-Kempkes, Sascha 35394 Giessen / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20208242.6 | 17.11.2020 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001673 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B11/00, F16B37/04 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
F16B11/006 (EP);
B29C65/4845 (US);
F16B23/0007 (US);
F16B37/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN EINES BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTS MIT EINEM WERKSTÜCK | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD FOR JOINING A FASTENER TO A WORKPIECE | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION À UNE PIÈCE À USINER | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/18] | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2011023683 (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1-10 * figures 3-4 * * claims 1,4,5 * * page 6, lines 15-22 * * page 21, lines 20-25 *; | [XYI]US2016201707 (WOOD COLIN LESLIE HEARL [GB]) [X] 11 * figure 44 * [Y] 2,3[I] 12-15; | [Y]US2018149181 (GRAMSCH-KEMPKES SASCHA [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102004012786 | WO2011023683 | DE102009042467 | EP3234379 |