EP3825977 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR VEHICLE PLATOONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERE Global B.V. Kennedyplein 222 5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATANASIU, Radu-Florian Washingtonplatz 3 D-64287 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
GU, Jiaqing Ruhlandstr. 36c D-63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 03 /
GEHRSITZ, Thomas Berger Strasse 191 D-0385 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
LOPEZ-NAVARRO, Jeronimo Schneidhainer Str. 10B D-61462 Königstein im Taunus / DE | 05 /
VAN DE HOEF, Sebastian Lutherstr. 70 D-63225 Langen / DE | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20208687.2 | 19.11.2020 | [2021/21] | Priority number, date | US201916689158 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: US201916689158 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825977 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/00, H04L29/08, G01C21/34 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
G08G1/22 (EP,US);
G01C21/3407 (US);
G01C21/3438 (EP);
G01C21/3453 (US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
H04L67/12 (EP);
G01C21/3461 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] |
Former [2021/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR FAHRZEUGKOLONNENBILDUNG | [2021/21] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR VEHICLE PLATOONING | [2021/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR POUR PELOTON DE VÉHICULES | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 25.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019286120 (STENNETH LEON [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * claim 1 * * figures 4, 5 *; | [X]EP3552071 (PCMS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0065] ** figures 1-6 * |